Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Cavalieri, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1667BornNapoli
21 Jan 171851.1AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
13 Feb 171851.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
Jul 172861.5DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Cavalieri:
Bishop Bernardo Cavalieri C.R. Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1723
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013