Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Décio Sossai Zandonade, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Colatina, Espirito Santo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1942 BornVenda Nova do Imigrante
16 Jan 196724.1ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Dec 197230.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Dec 199654.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
11 Dec 199654.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena
2 Feb 199754.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena
14 May 200360.4AppointedBishop of Colatina, Espirito Santo, Brazil
14 May 201471.4ResignedBishop of Colatina, Espirito Santo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Décio Sossai Zandonade:
Bishop Décio Sossai Zandonade S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Colatina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Colatina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,920
  • r: Bollettino, 14 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Jul 2014