Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Newton de Almeida Baptista

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1904Born
28 Oct 192824.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 194439.6AppointedBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
3 Sep 194439.8Ordained BishopBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
5 Jan 195449.2AppointedArchbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
12 Mar 196055.4AppointedArchbishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
9 Nov 196359.0AppointedBishop of Brazil, Military
15 Feb 198479.3RetiredArchbishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
31 Oct 199086.0RetiredBishop of Brazil, Military
11 Nov 200197.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil

MicroData Summary
José Newton de Almeida Baptista
Archbishop José Newton de Almeida Baptista
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Brasília

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiteroi, Diocese of Petrópolis
Ordained BishopRio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 73.0 years
  • a bishop for 57.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1944, Number 38
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025