Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luiz Mancilha Vilela, SS.CC.

Archbishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1942 BornPouso Alto
21 Dec 196826.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
3 Dec 198543.6AppointedBishop of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo, Brazil
22 Feb 198643.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cachoeiro do Itapemirim, Espirito Santo, Brazil
3 Dec 200260.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
14 Apr 200461.9SucceededArchbishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Mancilha Vilela:
Archbishop Luiz Mancilha Vilela SS.CC. (born ) Archbishop of Vitória

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Vitória.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 May 2014