Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Bosi Dal’Bó

Bishop of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1962 Born
5 Dec 199937.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Colatina, Espirito Santo, Brazil
10 Jun 200037.7Ordained PriestPriest of Colatina, Espirito Santo, Brazil
21 Oct 201553.1AppointedBishop of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil
12 Dec 201553.2Ordained BishopBishop of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil
26 Dec 201553.3InstalledBishop of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Bosi Dal’Bó
Bishop Paulo Bosi Dal’Bó (born ) Bishop of São Mateus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio Bananal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Mateus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2015
  • bp/c01/od: CB, 21 Oct 2015
  • ob: CB, 23 Oct 2015
  • c2+: CB, 23 Nov 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,688

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast