Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florian Wörner

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Hierpiniana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1970 Born
4 May 199727.2Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
5 Jun 201242.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
5 Jun 201242.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana
28 Jul 201242.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana

MicroData Summary for Florian Wörner
Bishop Florian Wörner (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGarmisch-Partenkirchen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Augsburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2012
  • ob: CB, 5 Jun 2012
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,513

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast