Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Losinger

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Vazi-Sarra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1957 BornFriedberg
3 Jul 198326.4Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
6 Jun 200043.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
6 Jun 200043.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vazi-Sarra
16 Jul 200043.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vazi-Sarra

MicroData Summary for Anton Losinger:
Bishop Anton Losinger (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Augsburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,808

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013