Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Grünwald

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Fronta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1936 BornAugsburg
29 May 196023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
21 Feb 199558.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
21 Feb 199558.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Fronta
18 Mar 199558.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fronta
4 Oct 201175.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Grünwald:
Bishop Josef Grünwald (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Augsburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,590

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013