Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Georg Maximilian Cardinal Sterzinsky

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Berlin, Germany

Cardinal-Priest of San Giuseppe all’Aurelio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1936Born
29 Jun 196024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany
28 May 198953.3AppointedBishop of Berlin, Germany
9 Sep 198953.5Ordained BishopBishop of Berlin, Germany
28 Jun 199155.3Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199155.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giuseppe all’Aurelio
27 Jun 199458.3AppointedArchbishop of Berlin, Germany
24 Feb 201175.0RetiredArchbishop of Berlin, Germany
30 Jun 201175.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Berlin, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Maximilian Sterzinsky (VIAF: 3366610)
Georg Maximilian Cardinal Sterzinsky (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Berlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarlack

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
  • a cardinal for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2011
  • d: CB, 30 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,469
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017