Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Doyle Gleeson, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fairbanks, Alaska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1895BornCarrollton, MO
31 Jul 191419.5ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
29 Jul 192631.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Feb 192833.0Solemn ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
8 Jan 194852.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alaska, USA
8 Jan 194852.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cotenna
5 Apr 194853.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cotenna
8 Aug 196267.5AppointedBishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
15 Nov 196873.8ResignedBishop of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
15 Nov 196873.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cuicul
15 Jan 197175.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Cuicul
30 Apr 198388.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Doyle Gleeson:
Bishop Francis Doyle Gleeson S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fairbanks

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 24
  • c1: CB, 28 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015