Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Patrick Reilly

Bishop Emeritus of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1928 Born
30 May 195325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
5 Jun 197547.0AppointedBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA
6 Aug 197547.2Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, Connecticut, USA
27 Oct 199466.4AppointedBishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
8 Dec 199466.5InstalledBishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
9 Mar 200475.8RetiredBishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Patrick Reilly
Bishop Daniel Patrick Reilly (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Worcester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProvidence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island
Ordained PriestSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Providence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island
Ordained BishopNorwich, Diocese of Norwich, Connecticut

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Worcester.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast