Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christie Albert Macaluso

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

Titular Bishop of Grass Valley


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1945 Born
21 May 197125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
18 Mar 199751.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
18 Mar 199751.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Grass Valley
10 Jun 199751.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Grass Valley
15 Dec 201772.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Christie Albert Macaluso
Bishop Christie Albert Macaluso (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hartford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHartford, Archdiocese of Hartford, Connecticut
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Hartford, Archdiocese of Hartford, Connecticut

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Hartford.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,012
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast