Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hans-Reinhard Koch

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Erfurt, Germany

Titular Bishop of Mediana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1929Born
17 Jul 195525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany
15 May 198555.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany
15 May 198555.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mediana
6 Jul 198555.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mediana
27 Nov 200475.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Erfurt, Germany
25 Apr 201888.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Erfurt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hans-Reinhard Koch (VIAF: 38055323)
Bishop Hans-Reinhard Koch (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Erfurt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeinefelde

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast