Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Leo Jozef Cardinal Suenens

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1904BornIxelles
4 Sep 192723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
12 Nov 194541.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium
12 Nov 194541.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Isinda
16 Dec 194541.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isinda
24 Nov 196157.4AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
24 Nov 196157.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Belgium, Military
19 Mar 196257.7Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 196257.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
197974.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Belgium, Military
4 Oct 197975.2RetiredArchbishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
6 May 199691.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Leo Jozef Suenens:
Cardinal Leo Jozef Suenens (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

  • a priest for 68.7 years
  • a bishop for 50.4 years
  • a cardinal for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013