Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simone Lorenzo Salvi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Subiaco, Italy

Titular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1879Born
3 Dec 189516.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Oct 190222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Nov 191738.0AppointedAbbot of Subiaco, Italy
30 Sep 192747.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
28 Oct 192748.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
26 May 196484.5DiedAbbot of Subiaco, Italy

MicroData Summary for Simone Lorenzo Salvi
Bishop Simone Lorenzo Salvi O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Subiaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLama dei Peligni

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast