Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Vu Văn Thin

Archbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1960 Born
24 Jan 198827.2Ordained PriestPriest of Hải Phng, Viet Nam
26 Nov 200242.0AppointedBishop of Hải Phng, Viet Nam
2 Jan 200342.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hải Phng, Viet Nam
17 Nov 201858.0AppointedArchbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Vu Văn Thin
Archbishop Joseph Vu Văn Thin (born ) Archbishop of H Nội

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKe Sat, Hai Duong
Ordained BishopCathedral, Hải Phng, Diocese of Hải Phng

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of H Nội.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,297
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 17 Nov 2018

Quantcast