Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Calara Mallari

Bishop of San Jose


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1958 BornMasantol
15 Mar 198224.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of San Fernando, Philippines
27 Nov 198224.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Fernando, Philippines
14 Jan 200647.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Fernando, Philippines
14 Jan 200647.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Erdonia
27 Mar 200648.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erdonia
15 May 201254.1AppointedBishop of San Jose, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Roberto Calara Mallari:
Bishop Roberto Calara Mallari (born ) Bishop of San Jose

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Jose.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,103
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013