Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Narciso Villaver Abellana, M.S.C.

Bishop of Romblon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1953 BornTalisay City
2 Jun 197723.5Solemn ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
28 Dec 197825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
15 Oct 201359.9AppointedBishop of Romblon, Philippines
11 Dec 201360.0Ordained BishopBishop of Romblon, Philippines
9 Jan 201460.1InstalledBishop of Romblon, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Narciso Villaver Abellana:
Bishop Narciso Villaver Abellana M.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Romblon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Romblon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2013
  • ob/i: CB, 6 Nov 2013
  • c2+: CB, 10 Dec 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 159
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,992

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015