Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Elmer Imas Mangalinao

Bishop of Bayombong, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1960 Born
15 Oct 198525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cabanatuan, Philippines
31 May 201656.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
31 May 201656.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Urusi
22 Aug 201656.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urusi
24 May 201858.1AppointedBishop of Bayombong, Philippines
25 Jul 201858.2InstalledBishop of Bayombong, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jose Elmer Imas Mangalinao
Bishop Jose Elmer Imas Mangalinao (born ) Bishop of Bayombong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCabiao, Nueva Ecija, Diocese of Cabanatuan
Ordained BishopCathédrale Saint Nicholas of Tolentine, Cabanatuan, Diocese of Cabanatuan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bayombong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2016
  • ob: CB, 1 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 2 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,079
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 May 2018
  • i: CB, 29 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast