Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Porto Nacional

Dioecesis Portus Nationalis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 20 December 1915
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Palmas
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Tocatins
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 96,488 (37,268 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centro-Oeste
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 2, Rua Padre Antonio 1856, 77500-000 Porto Nacional, TO, Brazil
  • Telephone: (063) 863-1392
  • Fax: 863-3555

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
20 December 1915ErectedDiocese of Goiás Diocese of Porto Nacional (erected)
4 July 1924Territory LostDiocese of Porto Nacional Territorial Prelature of Bananal (erected)
20 December 1954Territory LostDiocese of Porto Nacional Territorial Prelature of Tocantinópolis (erected)
11 October 1966Territory LostDiocese of Porto Nacional Territorial Prelature of Miracema do Norte (erected)
27 March 1996Territory LostDiocese of Miracema do Tocantins
Diocese of Porto Nacional
Archdiocese of Palmas (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1949250,000260,00096.2%8831,2501315ap1951
1966162,807198,00082.2%17179,5764399ap1967
1970150,000160,73193.3%131311,53810ap1971
1976190,000200,00095.0%1511611,87513513ap1977
1980226,000246,00091.9%1621812,55524219ap1981
1990290,000315,00092.1%1711816,11114715ap1991
1999274,000323,00084.8%2012113,04714320ap2000
2000271,000319,86184.7%2012112,90414320ap2001
2001271,000319,86184.7%2222411,29124625ap2002
2002276,000324,00085.2%2122312,00024625ap2003
2003276,000324,00085.2%263299,51735126ap2004
2004276,000319,86186.3%263299,51735126ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 May 2014