Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Aristeu Vieira

Bishop of Luz, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1952 BornRio Vermelho
13 Oct 197927.2Ordained PriestPriest of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Feb 201562.6AppointedBishop of Luz, Minas Gerais, Brazil
2 May 201562.8Ordained BishopBishop of Luz, Minas Gerais, Brazil
14 Jun 201562.9InstalledBishop of Luz, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Aristeu Vieira:
Bishop José Aristeu Vieira (born ) Bishop of Luz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Luz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+/i: CB, 3 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,488

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015