Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislas Henri Verjus, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of New Guinea

Titular Bishop of Limyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1860BornOleggio, Italy
1 Nov 188323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
10 May 188929.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of New Pomerania, Papua New Guinea
10 May 188929.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Limyra
22 Sep 188929.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limyra
28 Dec 188929.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of New Guinea
13 Nov 189232.5DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Stanislas Henri Verjus:
Bishop Stanislas Henri Verjus M.S.C. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of New Guinea

  • a priest for 9.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 343

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013