Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Austin Konderla

Bishop of Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1960 Born
3 Jun 199535.0Ordained PriestPriest of Austin, Texas, USA
13 May 201655.9AppointedBishop of Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
29 Jun 201656.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA

MicroData Summary for David Austin Konderla
Bishop David Austin Konderla (born ) Bishop of Tulsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBryan, TX, Diocese of Austin, Texas
Ordained PriestSan Jose, Church, Austin, Diocese of Austin, Texas
Ordained BishopDonald W. Reynolds Center Arena, Tulsa, Diocese of Tulsa, Oklahoma

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tulsa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2016
  • mn/ob: CB, 13 May 2016
  • c1: Website of the Diocese, 13 May 2016
  • c2+: CB, 10 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,948
  • op.loc: CB, 1 Nov 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 3 Nov 2022