Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Albert Wack, C.S.C.

Bishop of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1967 Born
28 Aug 199326.1Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
9 Apr 199426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
29 May 201749.9AppointedBishop of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida, USA
22 Aug 201750.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for William Albert Wack
Bishop William Albert Wack C.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Pensacola-Tallahassee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSouth Bend, Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana
Ordained BishopPensacola Bay Center, Pensacola, Diocese of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pensacola-Tallahassee.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 May 2017
  • mn/ob/c2: CB, 29 May 2017
  • c34: CB, 6 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Aug 2017