Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Cantú

Coadjutor Bishop of San Jose in California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1966 Born
6 Nov 199326.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
21 May 199427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
10 Apr 200841.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
10 Apr 200841.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
2 Jun 200841.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
26 May 201043.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Antonio, Texas, USA
14 Oct 201043.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of San Antonio, Texas, USA
10 Jan 201346.0AppointedBishop of Las Cruces, New Mexico, USA
28 Feb 201346.2InstalledBishop of Las Cruces, New Mexico, USA
11 Jul 201851.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Jose in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Oscar Cantú (VIAF: 305308612)
Bishop Oscar Cantú (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of San Jose in California

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHouston, TX, Diocese of Galveston-Houston, Texas
Ordained BishopSaint Mark the Evangelist, Church, San Antonio, Archdiocese of San Antonio, Texas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Jose in California.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,754
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jul 2018

Quantcast