Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierluigi Sartorelli

Deceased

Apostolic Pro-Nuncio Emeritus to Kenya

Titular Archbishop of Castello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1912BornVenezia, Italy
19 Sep 194229.7Ordained PriestPriest of Rijeka (-Opatija), Croatia
9 Nov 196754.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Semina
9 Nov 196754.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Kenya
8 Dec 196754.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Semina
19 Apr 196855.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Tanzania
22 Dec 197058.0ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Tanzania
7 Oct 197259.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Castello
16 Jan 197663.0ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Kenya
28 Apr 199683.3DiedApostolic Pro-Nuncio Emeritus to Kenya

MicroData Summary for Pierluigi Sartorelli:
Archbishop Pierluigi Sartorelli (born , died ) Apostolic Pro-Nuncio Emeritus of Kenya

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013