Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexis Pham Van Lôc

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kontum, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1919Born
21 Aug 195132.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 197556.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kontum, Viet Nam
27 Mar 197556.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Respecta
27 Mar 197556.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Respecta
2 Oct 197556.5SucceededBishop of Kontum, Viet Nam
8 Apr 199576.0RetiredBishop of Kontum, Viet Nam
17 Nov 201192.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Kontum, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Alexis Pham Van Lôc
Bishop Alexis Pham Van Lôc (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kontum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuê

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 20 Nov 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast