Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Moises Magpantay Cuevas

Auxiliary Bishop of Zamboanga, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Maraguia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1973 Born
6 Dec 200027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Zamboanga, Philippines
19 Mar 202046.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
19 Mar 202046.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Maraguia
24 Aug 202046.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maraguia

MicroData Summary for Moises Magpantay Cuevas
Bishop Moises Magpantay Cuevas (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zamboanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBatangas City, Archdiocese of Lipa
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Zamboanga City, Archdiocese of Zamboanga

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Zamboanga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Jun 2020
  • mn: CB, 28 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast