Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cagayan de Oro

Archidioecesis Cagayanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Antonio Javellana Ledesma, S.J., Archbishop
  • Jesus B. Tuquib, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 29 June 1951
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 3,799 (1,467 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises two civil provinces, Misamis Oriental and Camiguin, an island province to the north, and a town in Bukidnon
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's Residence, P.O. Box 113, Fernandez St., Brgy. 1, 9000 Cagayan de Oro City, Philippines
  • Telephone: (088)857-1357
  • Fax: (08822)72-63-04

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cagayan de Oro
20 January 1933ErectedDiocese of Zamboanga Diocese of Cagayan de Oro (erected)
3 June 1939Territory LostDiocese of Cagayan de Oro (Provinces of Suigao and Agusan) Diocese of Surigao (erected)
27 January 1951Territory LostDiocese of Cagayan de Oro (Provinces of Lanao and Misamis Occiental) Territorial Prelature of Ozamis (erected)
Archdiocese of Cagayan de Oro
29 June 1951ElevatedDiocese of Cagayan de Oro Archdiocese of Cagayan de Oro

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Cagayan de Oro
1950600,247984,63461.0%4634807,503426845ap1951
Archdiocese of Cagayan de Oro
1958452,600520,00087.0%2157785,802646646ap1960
1970484,038534,34690.6%1647637,6833510734ap1971
1980519,000649,00080.0%2742697,5214211343ap1981
1990802,000808,00099.3%4041819,9014216245ap1991
19991,543,5961,754,08788.0%685111912,9715718749ap2000
20001,543,5961,754,08788.0%744712112,7565118950ap2001
20011,020,3801,200,44785.0%75421178,7214819450ap2002
20021,020,3801,200,44785.0%78411198,5744524853ap2003
20031,030,8851,200,44785.9%77351129,2046221354ap2004
20041,071,3991,284,47883.4%88421308,2418113754ap2005
20061,158,0001,397,00082.9%85441298,97610120056ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013