Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albertus Odoricus Timmer, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Luanfu, China

Titular Bishop of Druzipara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1859Born
9 Oct 188121.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
10 Mar 188323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
31 Jul 190141.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}, China
31 Jul 190141.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Druzipara
28 Oct 190141.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Druzipara
20 Aug 192666.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Luanfu, China
26 Apr 194383.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Luanfu, China

MicroData Summary for Albertus Odoricus Timmer
Bishop Albertus Odoricus Timmer O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Luanfu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHaarlem, Diocese of Haarlem, Netherlands
Ordained BishopMatchang
Death PlaceTayüanfu

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,927
  • ob/r/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 251
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,901, Number 59
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast