Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Maria Bessa Taipa

Auxiliary Bishop of Porto

Titular Bishop of Tabbora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1942 BornFreamunde (Paços de Ferreira)
15 Aug 196623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
22 Feb 199956.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal
22 Feb 199956.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabbora
18 Apr 199956.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabbora

MicroData Summary for António Maria Bessa Taipa:
Bishop António Maria Bessa Taipa (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Porto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Porto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,501

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015