Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislaw Adam Sygnet

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland

Titular Bishop of Sufasar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1924Born
25 May 195227.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sandomierz, Poland
20 Sep 197652.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland
20 Sep 197652.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufasar
24 Oct 197652.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufasar
1 Nov 198561.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanislaw Adam Sygnet
Bishop Stanislaw Adam Sygnet (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrepa Koscielna

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018