Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kiro Stojanov

Bishop of Skopje, Macedonia

Bishop of Beata Maria Vergine Assunta in Strumica-Skopje (Macedonian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1959 Born
6 Apr 198626.9Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jan 199939.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Skopje, Macedonia
4 Jan 199939.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuriones
1 May 199940.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuriones
20 Jul 200546.2AppointedBishop of Skopje, Macedonia
20 Jul 200546.2AppointedApostolic Exarch of Macedonia (Macedonian)
31 May 201859.1AppointedBishop of Beata Maria Vergine Assunta in Strumica-Skopje (Macedonian)

MicroData Summary for Kiro Stojanov
Bishop Kiro Stojanov (born ) Bishop of Skopje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadovo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Skopje, Diocese of Skopje

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Skopje.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jul 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,546
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast