Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joakim Herbut

Deceased

Bishop of Skopje, North Macedonia

Apostolic Exarch of Macedonia (Macedonian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1928Born
6 Jul 195224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
2 Oct 196941.6AppointedBishop of Skopje-Prizren, North Macedonia
21 Dec 196941.8Ordained BishopBishop of Skopje-Prizren, North Macedonia
11 Jan 200172.9AppointedApostolic Exarch of Macedonia (Macedonian)
15 Apr 200577.1DiedBishop of Skopje, North Macedonia

MicroData Summary for Joakim Herbut
Bishop Joakim Herbut (born , died ) Bishop of Skopje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRuski Krstur
Ordained BishopSacred Heart of Jesus, Cathedral, Vrhbosna, Archdiocese of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • opd/c1: CB, 23 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 382

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast