Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Skopje

Dioecesis Scopiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Kiro Stojanov, Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Archdiocese of Dardania
4th CenturyErectedArchdiocese of Dardania (erected)
Archdiocese of Skopje
1656Name ChangedArchdiocese of Dardania Archdiocese of Skopje
Diocese of Skopje
29 October 1924ElevatedArchdiocese of Skopje Diocese of Skopje (Archdiocese to Diocese)
Diocese of Skopje-Prizren
2 October 1969UnitedTitular See of Prisriana
Diocese of Skopje
Diocese of Skopje-Prizren
24 May 2000SplitDiocese of Skopje-Prizren Apostolic Administration of Prizren
Diocese of Skopje
Diocese of Skopje
24 May 2000SplitDiocese of Skopje-Prizren Apostolic Administration of Prizren
Diocese of Skopje

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Skopje
195028,1391,800,0001.6%167231,22315719ap1951
Diocese of Skopje-Prizren
197045,0003,000,0001.5%247311,451718820ap1971
198056,0003,550,0001.6%288361,555814921ap1981
199066,5004,078,0001.6%408481,385814725ap1991
199978,6002,300,0003.4%502521,511810425ap2000
Diocese of Skopje
200013,0002,300,000.6%111121,0831377ap2001
20014,0002,350,000.2%3141,0001142ap2002
20024,0002,350,000.2%3141,0001142ap2003
20033,5002,350,000.1%3148751142ap2004
20043,5722,350,000.2%3365953142ap2005
20103,6502,350,000.2%3366083142ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013