Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Pardini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jesi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1904Born
30 Mar 192924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chiavari, Italy
7 Jan 195348.4AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
22 Feb 195348.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jesi, Italy
30 Apr 197570.7ResignedBishop of Jesi, Italy
26 May 198782.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Pardini
Bishop Giovanni Battista Pardini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jesi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY, USA

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast