Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Zanchin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fidenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1912BornFratte di Santa Giustina in Colle
7 Jul 193522.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 196249.8AppointedBishop of Fidenza, Italy
11 Nov 196249.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fidenza, Italy
16 Dec 196250.0InstalledBishop of Fidenza, Italy
13 Aug 198875.7RetiredBishop of Fidenza, Italy
19 Sep 200390.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Fidenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Zanchin:
Bishop Mario Zanchin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fidenza

  • a priest for 68.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 177
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013