Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Bonfigioli

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1910Born
4 Feb 193423.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 196150.3AppointedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
21 May 196150.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
9 Nov 196353.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Siracusa, Italy
9 Nov 196353.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Darnis
6 Mar 196857.3SucceededArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
17 Apr 197362.4AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
11 Feb 198473.2ResignedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
18 Oct 199281.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bonfigioli
Archbishop Giuseppe Bonfigioli (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Carlo di Sant'Agnostino

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast