Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Salina

Dioecesis Salinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 23 December 1944
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kansas City in Kansas
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Kansas
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 69,087 (26,685 Square Miles)
  • Description: Cheyenne, Sherman, Wallace, Logan, Thomas, Rawlins, Decatur, Sheridan, Gove, Trego, Graham, Norton, Phillips, Rooks, Ellis, Russell, Osborne, Smith, Jewel, Mitchell, Lincoln, Saline, Ottawa, Cloud, Republic, Washington, Clay, Dickinson, Geary, Riley, and Marshall Counties.
  • Conference Region: IX (IA, KS, MO, NE)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: SAL
  • Official Web Site: http://www.salinadiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 103 N. 9th, Salina, KS 67402-0980
  • Telephone: (785)827-8746
  • Fax: 827-6133

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Concordia
2 August 1887ErectedDiocese of Leavenworth Diocese of Concordia (erected)
1 July 1897Territory AddedDiocese of Leavenworth Diocese of Concordia (Counties of Washington, Clay, Riley, Geary, and Dickinson)
Diocese of Salina
23 December 1944Name ChangedDiocese of Concordia Diocese of Salina

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Concordia
Diocese of Salina
195040,848316,82112.9%80401203404450099ap1951
196657,496336,21917.1%925514739150546101ap1967
197058,211336,72517.3%855113642855477100ap1971
197658,475331,84117.6%69401095364539498ap1977
198060,145327,90318.3%67361035834134598ap1981
199058,696336,60017.4%6125866822728095ap1991
199951,779321,13216.1%701585609122192ap2000
200049,058320,47515.3%6416806131621292ap2001
200150,113318,35915.7%6711786421222292ap2002
200249,246325,11215.1%66369713321192ap2003
200348,510325,11214.9%6614806061420592ap2004
200446,737318,14514.7%6410746311019888ap2005
201048,255342,00014.1%60167663471615183ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 29 Jul 2013