Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Steven Rausch

Deceased

Bishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1928Born
2 Jun 195627.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
5 Mar 197344.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
5 Mar 197344.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Summa
26 Apr 197344.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Summa
17 Jan 197748.3AppointedBishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA
18 May 198152.7DiedBishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA

MicroData Summary for James Steven Rausch
Bishop James Steven Rausch (born , died ) Bishop of Phoenix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbany, MN
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Cathedral, Saint Cloud, Diocese of Saint Cloud, Minnesota

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast