Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel de Jesus, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1746¹Born
1771¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
9 Dec 178640.9SelectedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
29 Jan 178741.0ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
13 Apr 178842.2Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
13 Jan 180054.0DiedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manoel de Jesus
Bishop Manoel de Jesus O.E.S.A. (born 1746, died ) Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGoa

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 406
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017