Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Liam Stephen Cary

Bishop of Baker, Oregon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1947 BornPortland
5 Sep 199245.0Ordained PriestPriest of Portland in Oregon, USA
8 Mar 201264.5AppointedBishop of Baker, Oregon, USA
18 May 201264.7Ordained BishopBishop of Baker, Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for Liam Stephen Cary:
Bishop Liam Stephen Cary (born ) Bishop of Baker

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Baker.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2012
  • ob: CB, 14 Mar 2012
  • c2+: CB, 7 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,437

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Apr 2014