Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Birch

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1911BornConhay
20 Jun 193725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ossory, Ireland
24 Jul 196250.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ossory, Ireland
24 Jul 196250.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
23 Sep 196251.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
10 Jan 196452.3SucceededBishop of Ossory, Ireland
7 Mar 198169.5DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Peter Birch:
Bishop Peter Birch (born , died ) Bishop of Ossory

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1962, Number 160
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015