Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Lennon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1914Born
19 Jun 193823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
14 May 196651.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
14 May 196651.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vina
3 Jul 196652.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vina
25 Sep 196753.2AppointedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
10 Dec 198773.4ResignedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
12 Jan 199075.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Lennon
Bishop Patrick Lennon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorris

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast