Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Neri Sendra (Sendrea)

Deceased

Bishop of Calabozo, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1844Born
17 Nov 186723.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 189147.0AppointedBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
6 Dec 189147.2Ordained BishopBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
9 May 192176.7DiedBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Felipe Neri Sendra (Sendrea)
Bishop Felipe Neri Sendra (Sendrea) (born , died ) Bishop of Calabozo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Maria d'Altagrazia, Diocese of Mérida
Ordained BishopCaracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 170
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017