Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Román Lovera

Deceased

Bishop of Mérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1839BornGuacara
23 Apr 186525.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 188041.0AppointedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
23 Jan 188141.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
1892¹52.4DiedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Román Lovera:
Bishop Román Lovera (born ) Bishop of Mérida

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013