Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Rotondo (Rotundo)

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1807Born
10 Apr 183023.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 185042.7SelectedBishop of Brindisi, Italy
20 May 185043.1ConfirmedBishop of Brindisi, Italy
16 Jun 185043.2Ordained BishopBishop of Brindisi, Italy
12 Oct 185548.5SelectedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
17 Dec 185548.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
20 Jan 188577.8DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Rotondo (Rotundo)
Archbishop Giuseppe Rotondo (Rotundo) (born , died ) Archbishop of Taranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapua, Archdiocese of Capua
Ordained BishopCapua, Archdiocese of Capua

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 160, and Page 536
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 28
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,742

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast