Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Balducci, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fabriano e Matelica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1757BornForli
10 Mar 178123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
25 May 181860.7AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
7 Jun 181860.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
27 Sep 182265.1AppointedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
18 Jul 183779.9DiedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Balducci (VIAF: 88716034)
Bishop Pietro Balducci C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Fabriano e Matelica

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 191, and Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 May 2016