Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Maria Lenzi, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1761Born
19 Feb 178524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
3 May 181857.2SelectedBishop of Lipari, Italy
25 May 181857.2ConfirmedBishop of Lipari, Italy
7 Jun 181857.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
5 Apr 182564.1DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maria Lenzi
Bishop Carlo Maria Lenzi Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop of Lipari

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 241
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast