Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthäus Georg von Chandelle

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1745BornFrankfurt/Main
27 Feb 176822.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
6 Jun 176923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
5 Feb 181872.2SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
25 May 181872.5ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
9 Dec 182176.0Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
30 Jun 182680.6DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Matthäus Georg von Chandelle:
Bishop Matthäus Georg von Chandelle (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013